UT HB0387 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Highway Amendments
Title
Highway Amendments
Sponsors
Sen. Mike McKell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | House/ filed in HFILE |
2014-03-13 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in HCLERK |
2014-03-10 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in HSTRUL |
2014-03-07 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in HSTNAE |
2014-02-27 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTNAE |
2014-02-24 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2014-02-24 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2014-02-21 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2014-02-21 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-02-21 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2014/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HB0387.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2014/bills/hbillint/hb0387.pdf |