UT HB0425 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - House/ strike enacting clause in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - House/ strike enacting clause in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Offender DNA Fees
Title
Offender DNA Fees
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Wilson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | House/ strike enacting clause in HFILE | |
2011-03-04 | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in HSTRUL | |
2011-03-01 | House Comm - Not Considered in HSTJUD | |
2011-02-18 | House/ to standing committee in HSTJUD | |
2011-02-17 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-10 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-08 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HINTRO | |
2011-02-07 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2011-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2011-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2011/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HB0425.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2011/bills/hbillint/hb0425.pdf |