UT HJR008 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Promoting Awareness of Motorcycling Profiling
Title
Joint Resolution Promoting Awareness of Motorcycling Profiling
Sponsors
Rep. Walt Brooks [R] | Sen. Todd Weiler [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 60 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-04 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2022-02-08 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-08 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-08 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-01 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-01 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Transportation Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Transportation Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Transportation Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in House Transportation Committee |
2022-01-24 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Transportation Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-21 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-20 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-01-20 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |