UT HJR024 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-18 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-18 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Master Study Resolution
Title
Master Study Resolution
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Dee [R] | Sen. Scott Jenkins [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-18 | House/ to Lieutenant Governor in ELTGOV | |
2011-03-17 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK | |
2011-03-11 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2011-03-10 | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR | |
2011-03-10 | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR | |
2011-03-10 | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND | |
2011-03-10 | Senate/ lifted from Rules in SSTRUL | |
2011-03-10 | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO | |
2011-03-10 | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC | |
2011-03-10 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2011-03-10 | House/ lifted from Rules in HSTRUL | |
2011-03-10 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HINTRO | |
2011-03-10 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HINTRO | |
2011-03-10 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HINTRO | |
2011-03-10 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2011-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2011-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |