UT HJR024 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 4 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-17 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 4 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-17 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Recognizing Weber State University's 125th Anniversary
Title
Joint Resolution Recognizing Weber State University's 125th Anniversary
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-17 | House/ to Lieutenant Governor in LTGOV | |
2014-03-04 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK |
2014-03-04 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK |
2014-03-04 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2014-03-03 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2014-03-03 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2014-03-03 | House | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR |
2014-03-03 | House | Senate/ to House in HSPKR |
2014-03-03 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in SPRES |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ lifted from Rules in SSTRUL |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in S2ND |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO |
2014-03-03 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SSEC |
2014-03-03 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC |
2014-03-03 | House | House/ 3rd reading in HSPEC |
2014-02-28 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSPEC |
2014-02-28 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSPEC |
2014-02-28 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSPEC |
2014-02-28 | House | House/ placed on Time Certain Calendar in HSPEC |
2014-02-28 | House | House/ 2nd suspended in HSTRUL |
2014-02-28 | House | House/ lifted from Rules in HSTRUL |
2014-02-26 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2014-02-26 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2014-02-26 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2014-02-26 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-02-26 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |