UT SB0015 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-21 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-21 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Surety Requirements for Mining
Title
Surety Requirements for Mining
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-04 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-21 | Governor Signed in LTGOV | |
2011-03-16 | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC | |
2011-03-16 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC | |
2011-02-07 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2011-02-07 | Senate/ received from House in SPRES | |
2011-02-04 | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES | |
2011-02-04 | House/ 3rd reading in HCON | |
2011-02-01 | House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in HSTNAE | |
2011-01-31 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTNAE | |
2011-01-27 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2011-01-26 | Senate/ to House in HCLERK | |
2011-01-26 | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD | |
2011-01-25 | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD | |
2011-01-24 | Senate/ Rules to calendar in S2ND | |
2011-01-20 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2011-01-11 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in LRGC | |
2011-01-07 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in LRGC | |
2010-12-14 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2010-11-17 | LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis in LRGC |