UT SB0022 | 2014 | Regular Session
Note: Legislation replaced by SB0022S01
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-20 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-20 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Workforce Services Job Listing Amendments
Title
Workforce Services Job Listing Amendments
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Knudson [R] | Rep. Paul Ray [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSTEDW |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTEDW |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTEDW |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2014-01-22 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SINTRO |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2013-12-16 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2013-12-16 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-12-16 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
SB0022S01 (Replaced by) 2014-03-03 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2014/htmdoc/sbillhtm/SB0022.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2014/bills/sbillint/sb0022.pdf |