UT SB0023 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-29 - House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-29 - House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Life Science and Technology Tax Credit Amendments
Title
Life Science and Technology Tax Credit Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-01-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-29 | House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in HSUB | |
2012-02-29 | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTREV | |
2012-02-29 | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation in HSTREV | |
2012-01-30 | House Comm - Not Considered in HSTREV | |
2012-01-26 | House/ to standing committee in HSTREV | |
2012-01-26 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2012-01-25 | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK | |
2012-01-25 | Senate/ to House in HCLERK | |
2012-01-25 | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK | |
2012-01-25 | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD | |
2012-01-24 | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD | |
2012-01-24 | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND | |
2012-01-23 | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2012-01-23 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2012-01-20 | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SINTRO | |
2012-01-19 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2012-01-13 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in LRGC | |
2012-01-12 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in LRGC | |
2011-12-19 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2011-12-19 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2011-12-13 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |