UT SB0032 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Voting History Amendments
Title
Voting History Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-04 - Senate - Senate/ concurs with House amendment (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2022-03-15 | Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-16 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-02-16 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-02-08 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2022-02-04 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2022-02-04 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2022-02-04 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2022-02-04 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2022-02-04 | House | Senate/ concurs with House amendment in House Speaker |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in Senate Concurrence Calendar |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-02 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-02 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-02 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2022-02-01 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2022-02-01 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2022-01-28 | House | House/ return to Rules due to fiscal impact in House Rules Committee |
2022-01-28 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Substituted Bill |
2022-01-28 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Government Operations Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Government Operations Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Government Operations Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Government Operations Committee |
2022-01-26 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Government Operations Committee |
2022-01-19 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-01-19 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-18 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-18 | House | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-12-14 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-12-14 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Election Administration
Election Law
Government Operations (State Issues)
Government Records
Voting and Voter Registration
Election Law
Government Operations (State Issues)
Government Records
Voting and Voter Registration