UT SB0040 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
School Bus Inspection Revisions
Title
School Bus Inspection Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-22 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2017-03-17 | Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2017-02-22 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2017-02-22 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2017-02-22 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2017-02-22 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2017-02-22 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2017-02-22 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker |
2017-02-22 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2017-02-21 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2017-02-21 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Transportation Committee |
2017-02-17 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Transportation Committee |
2017-02-15 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Transportation Committee |
2017-02-14 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2017-02-14 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2017-02-14 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2017-02-14 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2017-01-27 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Printing in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2016-12-13 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2016-12-13 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |