UT SB0059 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-11 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-11 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Tax Amendments
Title
Tax Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate/ concurs with House amendment (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 63 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 2 to # 4 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 63 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 2 to # 4 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-11 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2022-02-11 | Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-11 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-02-11 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-02-10 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2022-02-10 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2022-02-10 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2022-02-10 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2022-02-10 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2022-02-10 | House | Senate/ concurs with House amendment in House Speaker |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in Senate Concurrence Calendar |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-09 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-09 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-09 | House | House/ substitute adoption failed from # 4 to # 6 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2022-02-09 | House | House/ substitute adoption failed from # 4 to # 5 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2022-02-09 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2022-02-08 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2022-02-07 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2022-02-07 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2022-02-04 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2022-02-04 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 2 to # 4 in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2022-02-04 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-01-28 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-28 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-28 | House | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ substituted from # 1 to # 2 in Senate Special Orders Calendar |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senate/ placed on Time Certain Calendar in Senate Special Orders Calendar |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2022-01-23 | Senate | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Printing in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-12-21 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 10 | 1002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 10 | 104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 10 | 1042 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 7 | 104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 7 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |