UT SB0076 | 2020 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Governmental Immunity Revisions
Title
Governmental Immunity Revisions
Sponsors
Sen. Todd Weiler [R] | Rep. Craig Hall [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-12 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-12 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-12 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2020-03-12 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2020-03-12 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2020-03-11 | House | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2020-03-09 | House | House/ comm rpt/ amended in House Judiciary Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Judiciary Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Judiciary Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 in House Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-14 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2020-02-14 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2020-02-13 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2020-02-13 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-01-29 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2020-01-27 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-01-27 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-01-27 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |