UT SB0123 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Restrictions on Lobbying Expenditures - Public Education
Title
Restrictions on Lobbying Expenditures - Public Education
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Dee [R] | Sen. Scott Jenkins [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-16 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-25 | Governor Signed in LTGOV | |
2011-03-17 | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC | |
2011-03-17 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC | |
2011-02-16 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2011-02-16 | Senate/ received from House in SPRES | |
2011-02-16 | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES | |
2011-02-16 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB | |
2011-02-15 | House/ committee report favorable in HSTEDU | |
2011-02-10 | House/ to standing committee in HSTEDU | |
2011-02-09 | House/ received from Senate in HINTRO | |
2011-02-09 | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK | |
2011-02-08 | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD | |
2011-02-01 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2011-01-31 | Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in SSTGOP | |
2011-01-31 | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation in SSTGOP | |
2011-01-31 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTGOP | |
2011-01-28 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTGOP | |
2011-01-27 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2011-01-26 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2011-01-26 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |