UT SB0124 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal Code Recodification Cross References
Title
Criminal Code Recodification Cross References
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-16 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2022-03-15 | Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-18 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-02-18 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-02-16 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2022-02-16 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2022-02-16 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2022-02-16 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker |
2022-02-16 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2022-02-15 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2022-02-15 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-02-14 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-02-11 | House | House Comm - Not Considered in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-02-07 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-07 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-07 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-07 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-01-24 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2022-01-20 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-01-20 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-01-20 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20A | 2 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 10 | 9 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 6 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 7 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
26A | 1 | 114 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 3 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
31A | 21 | 501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34A | 2 | 110 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
4 | 32 | 116 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 10 | 104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 10 | 403 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 13 | 110 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
53B | 28 | 304 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
53G | 11 | 405 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 14 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
58 | 37 | 8 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
62A | 2 | 120 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
62A | 3 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63G | 12 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63M | 7 | 502 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63M | 7 | 513 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63N | 10 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 2 | 803 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 2 | 807 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 9 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
76 | 5 | 501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
76 | 5 | 502 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
76 | 5 | 503 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
76 | 5 | 504 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
76 | 5 | 601 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
76 | 5 | 602 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
76 | 5 | 603 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
76 | 5 | 604 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
76 | 5 | 605 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
76 | 5 | 606 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
76 | 5 | 607 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
76 | 5 | 608 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
76 | 5 | 609 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
76 | 5 | 610 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
77 | 27 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
77 | 27 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
77 | 27 | 9 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
77 | 36 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
77 | 36 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
77 | 37 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
77 | 37 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
77 | 38 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
77 | 38 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
77 | 40 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
77 | 41 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
77 | 41 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
77 | 43 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
78A | 6 | 209 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
78B | 2 | 308 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
78B | 6 | 117 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
78B | 7 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
78B | 7 | 502 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
78B | 7 | 801 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
78B | 7 | 903 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
78B | 9 | 402 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
80 | 1 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
80 | 6 | 304 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
80 | 6 | 703 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
80 | 6 | 705 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
80 | 6 | 712 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
80 | 6 | 804 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |