UT SB0134 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-21 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-21 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Transparency in Health Care Provider Advertising
Title
Transparency in Health Care Provider Advertising
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-02 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-21 | Governor Signed in LTGOV | |
2011-03-16 | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC | |
2011-03-15 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC | |
2011-03-02 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2011-03-02 | Senate/ received from House in SPRES | |
2011-03-02 | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES | |
2011-03-02 | House/ 3rd reading in HCON | |
2011-02-28 | House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in HSTHHS | |
2011-02-25 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTHHS | |
2011-02-22 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-18 | Senate/ to House with amendments in HCLERK | |
2011-02-18 | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD | |
2011-02-17 | Senate/ floor amendment in S2ND | |
2011-02-09 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2011-02-08 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTWED | |
2011-02-01 | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in SSTWED | |
2011-02-01 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTWED | |
2011-01-28 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2011-01-27 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2011-01-27 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |