UT SB0146 | 2024 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Property Tax Offset Amendments
Title
Property Tax Offset Amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2024-01-29 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2024-01-29 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2024-01-25 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-01-25 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-01-25 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2024/bills/static/SB0146.html |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2024/bills/sbillint/SB0146.pdf |
Supplement | https://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2024/SB0146.fn.pdf |