UT SB0153S02 | 2014 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation SB0153
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Association Foreclosure Amendments
Title
Association Foreclosure Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate/ failed (Y: 8 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ filed in SFILE |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in SSEC |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ filed in SSEC |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ failed in SSEC |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment in S2ND |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in S2ND |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ circled in S2ND |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in S2ND |
2014-02-26 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in S2ND |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSTBUS |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSTBUS |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTBUS |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTBUS |
2014-02-25 | Senate | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in SSTBUS |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Senate Comm - Not Considered in SSTBUS |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTBUS |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTRUL |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2014-01-28 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-01-28 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
SB0153 (Replaces) 2014-02-26 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB