UT SB0227 | 2024 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Boards and Commissions Revisions
Title
Boards and Commissions Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - Senate - Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - Senate - Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2024-03-12 | Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2024-02-29 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2024-02-29 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2024-02-28 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2024-02-28 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2024-02-28 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2024-02-28 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker |
2024-02-28 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2024-02-26 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2024-02-26 | House | House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in House Government Operations Committee |
2024-02-26 | House | House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in House Government Operations Committee |
2024-02-26 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Government Operations Committee |
2024-02-23 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Government Operations Committee |
2024-02-22 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2024-02-21 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2024-02-21 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2024-02-21 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ placed back on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate Consent Calendar |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate Consent Calendar |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2024-02-12 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Rules Committee |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2024-02-09 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-02-09 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-02-09 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 68 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 4 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 5 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
23A | 2 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
23A | 2 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
26B | 1 | 409 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
26B | 1 | 412 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
26B | 1 | 413 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
26B | 1 | 426 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
26B | 1 | 429 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
32B | 2 | 205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
35A | 8 | 2103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
35A | 8 | 304 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
4 | 18 | 104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 6 | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 10 | 206 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 7 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
53B | 2 | 104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
61 | 1 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63A | 15 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63G | 2 | 501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63M | 7 | 504 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63M | 7 | 902 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63N | 7 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
7 | 1 | 203 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
78A | 11 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
78B | 22 | 402 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
80 | 5 | 702 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 6 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 8 | 204 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |