UT SB0228 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Penalties for Specified Juvenile Offenses
Title
Penalties for Specified Juvenile Offenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-12 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-22 | Governor Signed in ELTGOV | |
2013-03-19 | Senate/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC |
2013-03-13 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2013-03-12 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2013-03-12 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SPRES |
2013-03-12 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SPRES |
2013-03-12 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES |
2013-03-12 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in HSPKR |
2013-03-12 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB |
2013-03-11 | House | House/ 2nd reading/ suspension in H3RDSB |
2013-03-11 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDSB |
2013-03-05 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2013-03-05 | House | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK |
2013-03-05 | House | Senate/ to House in HCLERK |
2013-03-05 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in SCON |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SCON |
2013-02-28 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SCON |
2013-02-28 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SCON |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in SCON |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in SSTJLC |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in SSTJLC |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTJLC |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTJLC |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2013-02-25 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2013-02-25 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-02-25 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |