UT SB0236 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-16 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-16 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
GPS Tracking Authority
Title
GPS Tracking Authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-29 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-02-27 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-16 | Governor Signed in LTGOV | |
2012-03-14 | Senate/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2012-03-14 | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC | |
2012-03-13 | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC | |
2012-03-13 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC | |
2012-03-01 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2012-02-29 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2012-02-29 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2012-02-29 | Senate/ received from House in SPRES | |
2012-02-29 | House/ to Senate in SPRES | |
2012-02-29 | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES | |
2012-02-29 | House/ passed 3rd reading in HSPKR | |
2012-02-29 | House/ 3rd reading in HCON | |
2012-02-27 | House/ 2nd reading in HCON | |
2012-02-27 | House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in HSTLAW | |
2012-02-27 | House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in HSTLAW | |
2012-02-27 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTLAW | |
2012-02-22 | House/ to standing committee in HSTLAW | |
2012-02-21 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-21 | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK | |
2012-02-21 | Senate/ to House in HCLERK | |
2012-02-21 | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK | |
2012-02-21 | Senate/ 3rd reading in SCON | |
2012-02-15 | Senate/ 2nd reading in SCON | |
2012-02-15 | Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in SSTJLC | |
2012-02-15 | Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in SSTJLC | |
2012-02-15 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTJLC | |
2012-02-14 | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTJLC | |
2012-02-13 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTJLC | |
2012-02-13 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTJLC | |
2012-02-10 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTJLC | |
2012-02-09 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2012-02-09 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2012-02-08 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2012-02-08 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-08 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2012-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2012-02-04 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-03 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |