UT SB0241 | 2024 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State Funding Amendments
Title
State Funding Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ concurs with House amendment (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - Senate - Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - Senate - Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2024-03-12 | Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2024-03-01 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2024-02-29 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2024-02-29 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2024-02-29 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2024-02-28 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2024-02-28 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2024-02-28 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2024-02-28 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2024-02-28 | House | Senate/ concurs with House amendment in House Speaker |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in Senate Concurrence Calendar |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate Secretary |
2024-02-28 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2024-02-28 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2024-02-28 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2024-02-28 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2024-02-27 | House | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2024-02-26 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2024-02-26 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2024-02-26 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2024-02-26 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2 in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2024-02-26 | House | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2024-02-24 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2024-02-23 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2024-02-22 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2024-02-22 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2024-02-22 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2024-02-22 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate Consent Calendar |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Consent Calendar |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate Consent Calendar |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ Consent Calendar in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2024-02-13 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2024-02-13 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
26B | 1 | 318 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
26B | 1 | 335 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
26B | 3 | 910 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
39A | 2 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
4 | 17 | 114 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
4 | 17 | 115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
53F | 9 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63B | 25 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63B | 32 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63J | 1 | 206 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63J | 1 | 207 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63N | 3 | 403 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |