UT SB0242 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-29 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-29 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Assessment Area Amendments
Title
Assessment Area Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ concurs with House amendment (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-29 | Governor Signed in LTGOV | |
2011-03-14 | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC | |
2011-03-14 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC | |
2011-03-07 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2011-03-07 | Senate/ received from House in SPRES | |
2011-03-07 | House/ to Senate in SPRES | |
2011-03-04 | Senate/ to House in HSPKR | |
2011-03-04 | Senate/ uncircled in SCURCAL | |
2011-03-02 | Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in SCURCAL | |
2011-03-02 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2011-03-02 | House/ uncircled in H3RDSB | |
2011-02-24 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB | |
2011-02-23 | House/ comm rpt/ amended in HSTPOL | |
2011-02-23 | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in HSTPOL | |
2011-02-16 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-15 | Senate/ to House in HCLERK | |
2011-02-15 | Senate/ 3rd reading in SCON | |
2011-02-10 | Senate/ 2nd reading in SCON | |
2011-02-10 | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in SSTGOP | |
2011-02-10 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTGOP | |
2011-02-09 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTGOP | |
2011-02-09 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTGOP | |
2011-02-08 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2011-02-07 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2011-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2011-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |