VA HB1043 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 10 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0512)
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 10 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0512)
Summary
Polygraphs; victims of sex offenses. Provides that no law-enforcement officer, attorney for the Commonwealth, or other government official shall ask or require a victim of certain sex offenses to submit to a polygraph examination or other truth-telling device as a condition for proceeding with the investigation of such an offense. This bill incorporates
Title
Polygraph; no sexual offense victim shall be requested to submit for investigation to proceed.
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Marsden [D] | Del. Robert Mathieson [D] | Sen. Jennifer McClellan [D] | Del. David Poisson [D] |
Del. Stephen Shannon [D] | Del. Beverly Sherwood [R] | Del. Vivian Watts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0512) | |
2008-03-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 512 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-05 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-04 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1043ER) | |
2008-03-04 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-02-29 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-29 | House: Senate substitute agreed to by House 080895784-S1 (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-28 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-27 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-27 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1043S1 | |
2008-02-27 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 080895784-S1 | |
2008-02-27 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-02-27 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-26 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 080895784-S1 | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-12 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-12 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1043H1 | |
2008-02-11 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 080341784-H1 | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-09 | House: Committee substitute printed 080341784-H1 | |
2008-02-08 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-16 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2008-01-09 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-09 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 086518824 |
Same As/Similar To
HB1488 (Similar To) 2011-01-28 - House: Tabled in Militia, Police and Public Safety by voice vote
SB164 (Same As) 2010-02-16 - Senate: Left in Finance
SB164 (Same As) 2010-02-16 - Senate: Left in Finance
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB1043 |