VA HB1051 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0589)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0589)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Constitutional officers. Includes electronic or other systems among those items that a local governing body shall provide for the use of clerks of all courts of record as in the governing body's judgment may be reasonably necessary for the proper conduct of such offices. The bill also provides that if a proposed local budget reduces funding for a constitutional officer at a rate greater than the average rate of reduced funding for other agencies, exclusive of the school division, the locality shall give written notice to such constitutional officer at least 14 days prior to adoption of the budget, and the local governing body shall consider any written objection of the officer made within seven days of the notice. The bill contains a technical amendment.
Title
Constitutional officers; if proposed budget reduces funding of such officer, 14 day written notice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 15-N) (Y: 85 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 15-N) (Y: 85 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0589) | |
2014-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 589 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1051ER) |
2014-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (11-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-11 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 15-N) |
2014-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House (83-Y 15-N) |
2014-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1051H1 |
2014-02-10 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14104822D-H1 |
2014-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-07 | House | Committee substitute printed 14104822D-H1 |
2014-02-07 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-15 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2014-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2014-01-08 | House | Presented and ordered printed 14102402D |
Same As/Similar To
SB124 (Same As) 2014-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0360)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 1600 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 1656 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 2507 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1727 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |