VA HB1113 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0663)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0663)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Land exchange. Establishes a procedure that authorizes the Department of Conservation and Recreation to exchange parcels of land it owns for interest in property owned by a private company near Biscuit Run in Charlottesville.
Title
Biscuit Run; DCR to negotiate land exchange of certain acres in Albemarle County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (33-Y 7-N) (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0663) | |
2012-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 663 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-10 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-09 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-09 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1113ER) | |
2012-03-09 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-03-06 | Senate: Passed Senate (33-Y 7-N) | |
2012-03-06 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-03-05 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (10-Y 5-N) | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-13 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read third time and passed House (97-Y 1-N) | |
2012-02-10 | House: Printed as engrossed 12105228D-EH1 | |
2012-02-10 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments HB1113EH1 | |
2012-02-10 | House: Amendments by Delegate Toscano agreed to | |
2012-02-10 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 12105228D-H1 | |
2012-02-10 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-08 | House: Committee substitute printed 12105228D-H1 | |
2012-02-08 | House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12104017D |