VA HB1127 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0457)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Charter; Town of Virgilina. Moves the date of the elections for mayor and councilmen from May to November of each even-numbered year. The bill contains an emergency clause.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Charter; Town of Virgilina.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-30 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0457)
2012-03-30 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 457 (effective 3/30/12)
2012-03-09 Senate: Signed by President
2012-03-08 House: Signed by Speaker
2012-03-08 House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1127ER)
2012-03-08 House: Enrolled
2012-03-02 Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2012-03-02 Senate: Read third time
2012-03-01 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2012-02-28 Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
2012-02-27 Senate: Assigned Local Gov sub: Charter
2012-02-15 Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government
2012-02-15 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed
2012-02-14 House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2012-02-14 House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2012-02-13 House: Printed as engrossed 12101251D-E
2012-02-13 House: Engrossed by House as amended HB1127E
2012-02-13 House: Emergency clause added
2012-02-13 House: Committee amendment agreed to
2012-02-13 House: Read second time
2012-02-12 House: Read first time
2012-02-10 House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
2012-02-08 House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
2012-01-20 House: Assigned CC & T sub: #1
2012-01-11 House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
2012-01-11 House: Presented and ordered printed 12101251D

Subjects


Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+sum+HB1127
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HB1127+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HB1127E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HB1127ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+CHAP0457+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+vot+H0701V0034+HB1127
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+vot+H07V0081+HB1127
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+vot+HV0726+HB1127
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+vot+S07V0110+HB1127
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+vot+SV0817HB1127+HB1127
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+vot+SV0839HB1127+HB1127

Bill Comments

feedback