VA HB1135 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0465)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0465)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Purchase of Virginia-grown food products by state agencies and institutions and local school divisions. Requires that the Department of General Services to include a link to the Virginia Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services Virginia Grown website on the Department of General Services' central electronic procurement system to facilitate purchases of Virginia-grown food products. The bill also exempts purchase of Virginia-grown food products for use by a public body where the annual cost of the product is not expected to exceed $100,000.
Title
Virginia-grown food products; purchase by state agencies & institutions & local school divisions.
Sponsors
Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Kenneth Plum [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0465) | |
2016-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 465 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-09 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-09 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/9/2016 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1135ER) |
2016-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-16 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-16 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-15 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1135H1 |
2016-02-15 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 16105477D-H1 |
2016-02-15 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-11 | House | Committee substitute printed 16105477D-H1 |
2016-02-11 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 2-N) |
2016-01-20 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2016-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2016-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102525D |