VA HB116 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0357)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0357)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Pharmacy benefits; freedom of choice. Authorizes accident and sickness insurers proposing to issue preferred provider policies or contracts, health maintenance organizations, corporations providing preferred provider subscription contracts, and health care plans for state employees to select a single mail order pharmacy provider as an exclusive provider of pharmacy services that are delivered to the covered person's address by mail, common carrier, or delivery service.
Title
Mail order pharmacy; insurer not limited to a single provider for services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0357) | |
2010-04-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 357 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-03 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB116ER) | |
2010-03-03 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-02-25 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-25 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-02-24 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Rereferred to Commerce and Labor | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-28 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2010-01-28 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-01-27 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-27 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-26 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB116H1 | |
2010-01-26 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 10104425D-H1 | |
2010-01-26 | House: Read second time | |
2010-01-25 | House: Read first time | |
2010-01-21 | House: Committee substitute printed 10104425D-H1 | |
2010-01-21 | House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-05 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2010-01-05 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101117D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 2 | 3407.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 4312.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |