VA HB1176 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
In-state tuition; members of the Virginia National Guard. Provides that any member of the Virginia National Guard residing in Virginia shall be eligible for in-state tuition at a public institution of higher education.
Title
In-state tuition; members of the Virginia National Guard.
Sponsors
Del. Richard Anderson [R] | Del. Christopher Collins [R] | Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Kathleen Murphy [D] |
Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-18 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2016-02-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-02-10 | House | Committee substitute printed 16105411D-H1 |
2016-02-10 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 1-N) |
2016-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-19 | House | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2016-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2016-01-14 | House | Presented and ordered printed 16101645D |