VA HB1178 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0509)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0509)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Motor vehicle dealers; injunctive relief for failure to obtain a license. Provides that (i) the Motor Vehicle Dealer Board (the Board) or (ii) any licensed motor vehicle dealer who sustains injury or damage to his business or property may seek injunctive relief against any person who engages in business in the Commonwealth as a motor vehicle dealer or salesperson without a license. The bill further provides that if the Board or licensed motor vehicle dealer is successful, the court may also award reasonable attorney fees and costs.
Title
Motor vehicle dealers; injunctive relief for failure to obtain a license.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0509) | |
2018-03-29 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 509 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-07 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-07 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 7, 2018 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-02 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1178ER) |
2018-03-02 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-28 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with amendments (13-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-12 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-09 | House | Printed as engrossed 18102942D-E |
2018-02-09 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1178E |
2018-02-09 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2018-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-06 | House | Reported from Transportation with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102942D |