VA HB1197 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Lost or stolen firearms; failure to report; penalties. Creates a Class 3 misdemeanor for the offense of failing to report to law enforcement that a firearm a person owns or lawfully possesses has been lost or stolen. Subsequent violations of the law would be a Class 1 misdemeanor. The bill also creates a Class 1 misdemeanor for the knowingly false reporting of a lost or stolen firearm.
Title
Firearms; failure to report those lost or stolen, penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | House: Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2012-02-09 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2012-02-08 | House: Assigned MPPS sub: #1 | |
2012-01-19 | House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2012-01-19 | House: Presented and ordered printed 12103852D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+sum+HB1197 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HB1197+hil |