VA HB120 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Unemployment compensation; wage offset. Provides that the weekly unemployment benefit to which an eligible individual is entitled shall be reduced on a dollar-for-dollar basis by any wages in excess of $100 that the individual earns in that week. Currently such benefit is reduced dollar-for-dollar by wages in excess of $50 earned in a week.
Title
Unemployment compensation; wage offset.
Sponsors
Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2018-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-17 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2017-12-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2017-12-17 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100344D |