VA HB1221 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - House: Stricken from docket by Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - House: Stricken from docket by Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Discharge from a training center; consent of parent, guardian, or responsible person required. Provides that a consumer in a training center shall only be discharged upon consent of the consumer or, if the consumer lacks capacity to consent, upon the consent of his legally authorized representative and following disclosure of information regarding the actual availability and accessibility of services sufficient to meet the needs of the consumer in the community.
Title
Training center; a consumer shall only be discharged upon consent of consumer or representative.
Sponsors
Del. Benjamin Cline [R] | Sen. John Cosgrove [R] | Del. Sal Iaquinto [R] | Del. Barry Knight [R] |
Del. Harry Purkey [R] | Del. Christopher Stolle [R] | Del. Robert Tata [R] | Del. Ron Villanueva [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-31 | House: Stricken from docket by Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote | |
2012-01-26 | House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote | |
2012-01-24 | House: Assigned HWI sub: #4 | |
2012-01-19 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2012-01-19 | House: Presented and ordered printed 12104015D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+sum+HB1221 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HB1221+hil |