VA HB1222 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0674)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0674)
Summary
Charitable medical events; lack of notice. Amends criteria which a practitioner of the healing arts must meet in order to render free health care to an underserved population of Virginia, to require that the practitioner notify the Board of the dates and location of services provided at least 5 business days prior to the voluntary provision of services. This bill also provides that the Board shall allow a practitioner of the healing arts who meets the statutory criteria to provide volunteer services without prior notice for a period of up to three days, provided the nonprofit organization verifies that the practitioner has a valid, unrestricted license in another state.
Title
Charitable medical events; lack of notice to licensing board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0674) | |
2008-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 674 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-09 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-06 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-06 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1222ER) | |
2008-03-06 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-29 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Assigned Education sub: Health Licensing | |
2008-01-29 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2008-01-29 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-01-28 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-01-28 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-28 | House: Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-25 | House: Engrossed by House - floor substitute HB1222H2 | |
2008-01-25 | House: Substitute by Delegate Bowling agreed to 088567436-H2 | |
2008-01-25 | House: Floor substitute printed 088567436-H2 (Bowling) | |
2008-01-25 | House: Committee substitute rejected 088562436-H1 | |
2008-01-25 | House: Read second time | |
2008-01-24 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2008-01-23 | House: Read first time | |
2008-01-22 | House: Committee substitute printed 088562436-H1 | |
2008-01-22 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-09 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2008-01-09 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 084596436 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB1222 |