VA HB1226 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0860)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0860)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Wars recognized on Veterans Day and in local monuments and memorials. Adds the Global War on Terrororism, Operation Enduring Freedom, and Operation Iraqi Freedom to the wars that are recognized on Veterans Day and Memorial Day. The bill also adds the Global War on Terrorism and Operation Enduring Freedom to the wars or conflicts for which a locality may issue permits for the erection of monuments or memorials.
Title
Veterans Day; adds Global War on Terrorism, etc., to wars that are honored.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0860) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Enacted, Chapter 860 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB1226ER2) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-04-21 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) | |
2010-04-21 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (95-Y 0-N) | |
2010-04-20 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-04-13 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2010-03-15 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-13 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-13 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1226ER) | |
2010-03-13 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-03-05 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-12 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-12 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-11 | House: Printed as engrossed 10101806D-E | |
2010-02-11 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB1226E | |
2010-02-11 | House: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2010-02-11 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-10 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-09 | House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendments (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-29 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-27 | House: Assigned MPPS sub: #3 | |
2010-01-15 | House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2010-01-15 | House: Presented and ordered printed 10101806D |