VA HB1263 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0799)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0799)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
VDOT Integrated Directional Sign ("Logo Sign") Program. Provides for a broad-based evaluation of the "Logo Sign" Program by the Highway Commissioner.
Title
VDOT Integrated Directional Sign Program; maintenance, etc., of signs and impact of changes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (36-Y 1-N) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 0-N) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 0-N) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0799) | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 799 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-04-18 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB1263ER2) | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | House: Reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (36-Y 1-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 0-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (91-Y 0-N) | |
2012-04-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-04-09 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2012-03-05 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-02 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-02 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1263ER) | |
2012-03-02 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-22 | Senate: Reported from Transportation (11-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-14 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-14 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1263H1 | |
2012-02-13 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 12105188D-H1 | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-10 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-09 | House: Committee substitute printed 12105188D-H1 | |
2012-02-09 | House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-06 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-27 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #1 | |
2012-01-20 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-01-20 | House: Presented and ordered printed 12100544D |
Subjects
Advertising and Advertisements
Highways, Bridges, and Ferries
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Trade and Commerce
Highways, Bridges, and Ferries
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Trade and Commerce