VA HB1269 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0550)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0550)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Board of zoning appeals. Provides that if certain votes of a local board of zoning appeals result in a tie vote, the person filing an appeal may have the matter carried over until the next meeting.
Title
Zoning appeals, board of; appeals resulting in tie vote may be carried over until next meeting.
Sponsors
Del. Matt Fariss [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 3-N) (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 16-N) (Y: 86 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 16-N) (Y: 86 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0550) | |
2012-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 550 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-09 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-08 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1269ER) | |
2012-03-08 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 3-N) | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 1-N) | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-14 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 16-N) | |
2012-02-14 | House: Read third time and passed House (84-Y 16-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-10 | House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (18-Y 3-N) | |
2012-02-09 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 1-N) | |
2012-01-25 | House: Assigned CC & T sub: #2 | |
2012-01-20 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2012-01-20 | House: Presented and ordered printed 12104372D |