VA HB1271 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0800)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0800)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Sexually violent predators; civil commitment. Provides for determination by the Director of the Department of Corrections for referral of certain prisoners for assessment as sexually violent predators if they appear to meet the definition of sexually violent predators and to exclude from referral those who are incapacitated by debilitating illness. The bill also provides that the Director of the Department of Corrections, in coordination with the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, shall develop assessment protocols to determine whether the prisoner or defendant meets the definition of a sexually violent predator and shall report to the General Assembly by January 1, 2013. The bill also increases from 120 to 180 days the length of time the Commitment Review Committee has to complete its assessment of the prisoner or defendant for civil commitment and communicate its recommendation to the Attorney General. The bill has an effective date of January 1, 2013.
Title
Sexually violent predators; Director of DOC shall develop protocol for assessing prisoner, etc.
Sponsors
Del. Chris Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 0-N) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (36-Y 4-N) (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 0-N) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (36-Y 4-N) (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0800) | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 800 (effective 1/1/13) | |
2012-04-18 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB1271ER2) | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | House: Reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (36-Y 0-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 0-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (91-Y 0-N) | |
2012-04-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-04-09 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2012-03-09 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-08 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1271ER) | |
2012-03-08 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-03-02 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-02 | House: Senate substitute agreed to by House 12105686D-S1 (95-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-01 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-29 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (36-Y 4-N) | |
2012-02-29 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1271S1 | |
2012-02-29 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 12105686D-S1 | |
2012-02-29 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-02-29 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12105686D-S1 | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 1-N) | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-14 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-14 | House: Read third time and passed House (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1271H1 | |
2012-02-13 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 12105221D-H1 | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-10 | House: Committee substitute printed 12105221D-H1 | |
2012-02-10 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-08 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-24 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal | |
2012-01-20 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-01-20 | House: Presented and ordered printed 12104109D |
Same As/Similar To
SB314 (Same As) 2012-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0668)
Subjects
Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, Department of
Crimes and Offenses Generally
Prisons and Other Methods of Correction
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Crimes and Offenses Generally
Prisons and Other Methods of Correction
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 61 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 67.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 67.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 67.5:3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 169.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 903 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 904 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |