VA HB1272 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-20 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-20 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Public schools; virtual education. Provides that any student who enrolls full time in a virtual school program served by a multidivision online provider outside his school division of residence shall have his state and local share of Standards of Quality per pupil funding transferred from the school division of residence to the enrolling school division. The total state and local share funds transferred from the resident division to the enrolling division shall not exceed $6,500 per pupil. The enrolling school division shall invoice the resident school division monthly and the Department of Education semimonthly for a student participating in a virtual education program.
Title
Virtual school program; Standards of Quality per pupil funding transferred from school division.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-20 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2012-02-09 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2012-02-08 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-02-08 | House: Referred from Education by voice vote | |
2012-02-08 | House: Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education | |
2012-02-07 | House: Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-01-24 | House: Assigned Education sub: Teachers and Admin. Action | |
2012-01-20 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2012-01-20 | House: Presented and ordered printed 12104020D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+sum+HB1272 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HB1272+hil |