VA HB128 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0522)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0522)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Motion or petition for rule to show cause for violation of court order. Provides that, in any civil action in a court of record, a party requesting a rule to show cause for a violation of a court order shall file a motion or petition, which may be on a form prescribed by the Office of the Executive Secretary, with the court, which shall include facts identifying with particularity the violation or which shall be accompanied by an affidavit setting forth such facts. The introduced bill was a recommendation of the Boyd-Graves Conference.
Title
Court order; motion or petition for rule to show cause for violation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Amendment by Senator Surovell rejected (17-Y 23-N) (Y: 17 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (17-Y 1-N) (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Amendment by Senator Surovell rejected (17-Y 23-N) (Y: 17 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (17-Y 1-N) (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0522) | |
2018-03-29 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 522 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-20 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-09 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-09 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB128ER) |
2018-03-09 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-07 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-07 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 18107267D-S1 (97-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 2-N) |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB128S1 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Surovell rejected (17-Y 23-N) |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18107267D-S1 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18107267D-S1 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 1-N) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-09 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-09 | House | Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-08 | House | Printed as engrossed 18103433D-E |
2018-02-08 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB128E |
2018-02-08 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2018-02-08 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-05 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (17-Y 1-N) |
2018-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 1-N) |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2017-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-12-18 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103433D |