VA HB1294 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-8)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0804)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-8)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0804)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibition of certain local fees. Provides that localities shall not charge any fee to any church, synagogue, or other place of worship unless authorized by general law or special act of the General Assembly.
Title
Churches, synagogues, etc.; localities shall not charge any fee unless authorized by general law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 0-N) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute with amendments (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 95-N) (Y: 0 N: 97 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 0-N) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute with amendments (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 95-N) (Y: 0 N: 97 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0804) | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 804 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB1294ER2) | |
2012-04-18 | House: Reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (37-Y 0-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (95-Y 0-N) | |
2012-04-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-04-09 | House: Governor's substitute printed 12106303D-H1 | |
2012-04-09 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2012-03-17 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-15 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-15 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1294ER) | |
2012-03-15 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-03-10 | Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-09 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-09 | House: Conference report agreed to by House (90-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Senators: Smith, Blevins, Barker | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Conferees appointed by Senate | |
2012-03-08 | House: Delegates: Spruill, Knight, Minchew | |
2012-03-08 | House: Conferees appointed by House | |
2012-03-08 | House: House acceded to request | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Senate requested conference committee | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Senate insisted on substitute with amendments (36-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-08 | House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 95-N) | |
2012-03-08 | House: Senate substitute with amendments rejected by House 12105748D-S1 (0-Y 95-N) | |
2012-03-08 | House: Passed by temporarily | |
2012-03-08 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendments (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendments HB1294S1 | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Amendments by Senator Blevins agreed to | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Amendment #2 by Senator Marsden agreed to | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Amendment #1 by Senator Marsden withdrawn | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 12105748D-S1 | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-03-07 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2012-03-07 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-03-06 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2012-03-06 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-03-05 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2012-03-05 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12105748D-S1 | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-08 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-08 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-07 | House: Printed as engrossed 12104496D-E | |
2012-02-07 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB1294E | |
2012-02-07 | House: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2012-02-07 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-06 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-03 | House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-27 | House: Assigned CC & T sub: #2 | |
2012-01-24 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2012-01-24 | House: Presented and ordered printed 12104496D | |
2012-01-24 | House: Unanimous consent to introduce |