VA HB1303 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
General Assembly members; administrative and legislative assistants. Removes the obsolete title of secretary and replaces it with administrative assistant for the purposes of employment of staff for officers and members of the General Assembly. The bill also clarifies the distinction between administrative assistants, who are hired by the House and Senate Clerks, and legislative assistants, who are hired by each member of the General Assembly.
Title
General Assembly; administrative and legislative assistants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Left in Rules |
2024-03-07 | House | Rereferred to Rules |
2024-03-07 | House | Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to |
2024-03-06 | House | Passed by for the day |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1303S1 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 24108678D-S1 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24108678D-S1 |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Reported from Rules with substitute (12-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-07 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-06 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-01 | House | Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2024-01-10 | House | Presented and ordered printed 24104271D |