VA HB1304 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Required voting districts in certain cities. Requires every city with a population of 250,000 or greater to elect its council members by individual districts or wards, beginning with municipal elections held after January 1, 2025. The provisions of this bill supersede any contrary provisions of a city charter or any other provision of law.
Title
Elections; required voting districts in certain cities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred from Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2024-01-10 | House | Presented and ordered printed 24102053D |