VA HB1317 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Industrial hemp grower; public notice; buffer zone; odor mitigation. Requires any applicant for registration as a grower of industrial hemp to state either that the growing premises are more than 100 yards from any residential area or that the applicant has complied with pre-registration public notice and comment requirements set by the Commissioner of Agriculture and Consumer Services. The bill directs the Board of Agriculture and Consumer Services to adopt regulations requiring each registered grower of industrial hemp to maintain a buffer zone from the property lines of the growing premises and to perform odor mitigation at such premises during peak blooming season.
Title
Industrial hemp grower; public notice, buffer zone, odor mitigation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 4-N) (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-01-22 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 4-N) |
2020-01-15 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Agriculture |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103647D |