VA HB1326 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Nationally Certified School Psychologist Program established; incorporation into National Teacher Certification Incentive Reward Program Fund. Establishes the Nationally Certified School Psychologist Program, incorporates such program into the existing National Teacher Certification Incentive Reward Program Fund and renames such fund as the National Teacher Certification Incentive Reward Program and Nationally Certified School Psychologist Program Fund, and permits such fund to be used to award incentive grants to school psychologists employed in the public schools of the Commonwealth obtaining national certification from the National Association of School Psychologists consisting of an initial state-funded award of $5,000 and a subsequent award of $2,500 each year for the life of the certificate.
Title
Nationally Certified School Psychologist Program; established.
Sponsors
Del. Kim Taylor [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2024-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-21 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2024-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-01-11 | House | Presented and ordered printed 24104091D |