VA HB1332 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0729)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Statewide Telehealth Plan. Directs the Board of Health to develop and implement, by January 1, 2021, and thereafter maintain as a component of the State Health Plan a Statewide Telehealth Plan (the Plan) to promote an integrated approach to the introduction and use of telehealth services and telemedicine services, as those terms are defined in the bill. The bill requires the Plan to include, among other provisions, provisions for (i) the use of remote patient monitoring services and store-and-forward technologies, including in cases involving patients with chronic illness; (ii) the promotion of the inclusion of telehealth services in hospitals, schools, and state agencies; and (iii) a strategy for the collection of data regarding the use of telehealth services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Telehealth services; definitions, report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-06 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0729)
2020-04-06 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 729 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-06SenateSigned by President
2020-03-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-05HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1332ER)
2020-03-05HouseEnrolled
2020-03-02HouseVOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N)
2020-03-02HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 20109129D-S1 (97-Y 0-N)
2020-03-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-28SenatePassed Senate with substitute (37-Y 0-N)
2020-02-28SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N)
2020-02-28SenatePassed Senate with substitute (36-Y 0-N)
2020-02-28SenateReconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
2020-02-28SenatePassed Senate with substitute (37-Y 0-N)
2020-02-28SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1332S1
2020-02-28SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20109129D-S1
2020-02-28SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-28SenateRead third time
2020-02-27SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-26SenateCommittee substitute printed 20109129D-S1
2020-02-26SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2020-02-20SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-20SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2020-02-12SenateAssigned Education sub: Health Professions
2020-02-10SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-07HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-07HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1332H1
2020-02-06HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20107088D-H1
2020-02-06HouseRead second time
2020-02-05HouseRead first time
2020-02-04HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2020-02-04HouseCommittee substitute printed 20107088D-H1
2020-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N)
2020-01-15HouseAssigned HWI sub: Health Professions
2020-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2020-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104945D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321111.3(n/a)See Bill Text
321325(n/a)See Bill Text
3823418.16(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB1332&201+sum+HB1332
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1332+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1332H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1332S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1332ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP0729+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1202V0019+HB1332
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H12V0117+HB1332
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H12V0264+HB1332
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0635+HB1332
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S04V0282+HB1332
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0477+HB1332
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1203HB1332+HB1332
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1261HB1332+HB1332
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1295HB1332+HB1332
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1296HB1332+HB1332
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1297HB1332+HB1332
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1298HB1332+HB1332
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1667+HB1332

Bill Comments

feedback