VA HB1332 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Nuisance; action against adjoining property owner. Provides that a civil action may be brought by a property owner against the owner of an adjoining property alleged to be a nuisance for damages and reasonable attorney fees and costs. The bill further provides that a hearing held pursuant to such action shall be held 90 days after the filing of such action and that, if the defendant provides evidence that he has taken all actions necessary to correct the nuisance, the case shall be dismissed.
Title
Nuisance; action against adjoining property owner.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2024-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-02 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2024-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-01-11 | House | Presented and ordered printed 24100115D |