VA HB1362 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0531)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0531)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Division of Consolidated Laboratory Services; availability of testing services. Requires the Division of Consolidated Laboratory Services, or any other laboratory with which the Department of Health has contracted, to provide screening tests for time-critical disorders for newborns and children seven days a week. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2019.
Title
Newborn screening; tests for time-critical disorders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0531) | |
2018-03-29 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 531 (effective 1/1/19) | |
2018-03-15 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-15 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 15, 2018 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1362ER) |
2018-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-13 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1362H1 |
2018-02-12 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18105971D-H1 |
2018-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-09 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-06 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-06 | House | Committee substitute printed 18105971D-H1 |
2018-02-06 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-25 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-01-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-01-23 | House | Referred from General Laws by voice vote |
2018-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2018-01-11 | House | Presented and ordered printed 18103944D |