VA HB1367 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0739)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0739)
Summary
Freedom of Information Act (FOIA); exemption for local government investment pool. Adds a FOIA exemption for the records maintained by the Department of the Treasury or participants in the Local Government Investment Pool, to the extent such records relate to information required to be provided by such participants to the Department to establish accounts.
Title
Freedom of Information Act; exemption for local government investment pool.
Sponsors
Del. Chris Jones [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0739) | |
2008-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 739 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-09 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-06 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-06 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1367ER) | |
2008-03-06 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-29 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2008-02-27 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-19 | Senate: Assigned GL&T sub: Subcommittee #1 (FOIA) | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-12 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-12 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2008-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-08 | House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-17 | House: Assigned GL sub: FOIA | |
2008-01-09 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2008-01-09 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 080768818 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB1367 |