VA HB137 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0841)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0841)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Workers' compensation; injuries presumed to be in course of employment. Revises the provision enacted in 2011 that created a presumption, in the absence of a preponderance of evidence to the contrary, that an injury is work related if an employee is physically or mentally unable to testify and there is unrebutted prima facie evidence that the injury was work related. This measure substitutes the phrase "arose out of and were in the course of employment" for "were work related."
Title
Workers' compensation; injuries presumed to be in course of employment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (39-Y 55-N) (Y: 39 N: 57 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0841) | |
2012-05-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 841 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-04-18 | House: Communicated to Governor | |
2012-04-18 | House: VOTE: REJECTED (39-Y 55-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: House rejected Governor's recommendation (39-Y 55-N) | |
2012-04-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-04-09 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-07 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-07 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB137ER) | |
2012-03-07 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-29 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-24 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2012-01-24 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-01-23 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-23 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-20 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-01-19 | House: Read first time | |
2012-01-17 | House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-04 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2012-01-04 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101417D |